open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00054
    Party Name:Davis v. Dillard's, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned via Service by Secretary of State]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?111729
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =