open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00282
    Party Name:Drury v. University of Louisville
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Correction]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?111733
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =