open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00360
    Party Name:Bullitt County Sanitation District v. Keats
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appellant Reply Brief]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appellees Brief]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appellants Brief]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - Court Official]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Availability of Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bankruptcy Appeal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112227
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =