open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00060
    Party Name:Branch v. Toyo Automotive Parts (USA), Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112263
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =