open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00028-1
    Party Name:USA v. Navarro-Acosta
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reason]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acknowledgment of Rights]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supplemental Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Oath]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedules]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112607
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =