open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00519
    Party Name:Strong v. Norton Healthcare, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Agreed Order]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113064
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =