open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00518
    Party Name:Carter v. Durrett et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113063
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =