open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00133-1
    Party Name:USA v. Vazquez-Flores
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reason]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acknowledgment of Rights]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supplemental Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Oath]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113088
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =