open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00573
    Party Name:Waters v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113410
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =