open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00114
    Party Name:Henson v. Hart et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Notice of Deficiency (Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out - District]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113408
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =