open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00569
    Party Name:Rivera et al v. Mister P Express Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Production of Documents]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Interrogatories]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113407
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =