open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00039-1
    Party Name:USA v. Bowen
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Further Proceedings Hearing]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum (Application)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113419
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =