open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-70553-grs
    Party Name:Bessie Meria Thomas and Jason Dale Thomas
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay(Order)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Relief from Stay(Order)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Clerical Correction]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Audio File]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Hearing Set/Cont]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Response]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Incur Additional Debt]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation: Recommended (Virtual)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Payment of Fee (Installment Payment)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Adequate Protection Payments]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?307955
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =