open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00124
    Party Name:Kentucky Wesleyan College v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113845
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =