open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00638
    Party Name:Yurt v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113838
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =