open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00640
    Party Name:Stanley v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113871
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =