open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00128
    Party Name:First Financial Bank National Association v. Williams
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Agreed Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Correction]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Notice of Deficiency (Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Schedules - Motion and R&R Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?113872
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =