open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-21475-tnw
    Party Name:Steven D. Bobo and Alisha A. Bobo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation: Recommended (Virtual)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Entry re Telephonic Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Update Claim Status]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Relief from Stay(Order)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Regarding Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Payment of Fee (Installment Payment)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Disclosure of Fees by Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Submit Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [File (BNC)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?309638
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =