open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-21473-tnw
    Party Name:John C. Goldizen
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Autoclose deadline]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Debtor (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?309636
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =