open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00187
    Party Name:Motorists Mutual Insurance Company v. Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Correction re:PDF]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114870
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =