open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00876
    Party Name:Vertical Bridge Development, LLC et al v. Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Planning Commission et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Correction re:PDF]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114865
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =