open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:20-60422-grs
    Party Name:Pearl Baker and Michelle Baker
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Confirmation Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (BNC)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (BNC)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Adequate Protection Payments]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Change of Venue]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Change Venue (for 341 and Hearing Purposes ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Change Venue (for 341 and Hearing Purposes ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?311892
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =