open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:20-20545-tnw
    Party Name:Amanda M Regensburger
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:May 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?312769
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =