open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:4:20-cv-00127
    Party Name:Dame v. Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118038
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =