open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00131
    Party Name:Tomelleri v. Davenport Tackle Company, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118035
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =