open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:20-20794-tnw
    Party Name:Marty Gayle Martin and Jennifer Kay Martin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KENDRICK, LAWRENCE CRAIG [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Certificate of Service re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Debtor (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?313898
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =