open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:20-20795-tnw
    Party Name:Alysia Nichole Stewart and Daniel John Stewart
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Avoid Lien on Household Goods(O)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Defective Order]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Avoid Lien on Household Goods]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Trustee)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Adequate Protection Payments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?313899
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =