open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:20-32053-jal
    Party Name:Austin Phillip Maxwell Fowler
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Installment Payment or Full Filing Fee for New Case]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Reinstatement]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors - 341 - ALL Chapters]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Dismiss -Failure to Pay Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Notice of Continuance of 341-13 Trustee and Ch 11s ONLY]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments-Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Generate 341 Notice-Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lawrence, -13 William W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kywb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347160
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =