open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:20-32311-jal
    Party Name:Sarah B. Cundiff
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Financial Management Requirement]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee Preferred Methodology for Document Turnover]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Generate 341 Notice-Chapter 7]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [none]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 -Ind/Jt]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wheatley, Michael E. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.kywb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347637
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =