U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00377
  • Case Name: Lesley v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.