U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Turner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.