U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Hall v. Cygnus Home Service, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.