U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Dawson v. Meijer, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 13, 2022: [Deficiency]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.