U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00378
  • Case Name: Greenwell v. Preslar's Western Shop
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 25, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.