U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Williams v. Crafton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Trial]
  • September 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.