U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Ward v. Farm Credit Mid-America, FLCA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • September 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.