U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Jenkins v. Walmart, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proposed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.