U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Craig v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • October 07, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order - MDL]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • July 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.