U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00382
  • Case Name: O'Bannon v. Louisville Metro Government et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 15, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.