U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00384
  • Case Name: Parrott v. Kindred Healthcare, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 20, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.