U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Kunitsky v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.