U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00386
  • Case Name: Churchill Downs Racetrack, LLC v. Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 576
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 12, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • December 12, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 12, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 22, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.