U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Shaw v. Service One Credit Union, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.