U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Lovelace v. McCracken County, Kentucky et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Response]
  • September 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sealed Document - Court User Only]
  • September 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • September 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 12, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Recusal]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 05, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.