U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00390
  • Case Name: Bozeman v. Walker Mechanical Maintanace et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 10, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 09, 2023: [Schedules]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 29, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.