U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Main Event Entertainment
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Trial]
  • December 13, 2022: [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
  • December 13, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response]
  • December 05, 2022: [Answer to Interrogatories]
  • December 05, 2022: [Request for Interrogatories]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • November 30, 2022: [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
  • November 30, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.