U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00396
  • Case Name: Soete v. WAVE 3 TV
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.