U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Lynum v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • December 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 02, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.