U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00099
  • Case Name: MERS, LLC v. M/V CHARLES L STRAIT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.