U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Casey v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Fact/Law Summary]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Fact/Law Summary]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Docket Correction]
  • August 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • August 03, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • August 03, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.